1. Multiplication

Multiply 8 by 4. Solve this equation by adding the number "8" to the original "8" three times. 8+8+8+8=32

2. Division

Divide 10 by 2. Reduce 10 as many times as you can above the division line then reduce 2 as many times as you can under the division line. You should come up with 5/1. 10 is divided by 2 five times.

3. Fractions

Add 1/5 and 1/6. Multiply the first fraction by 6 and the second fraction by 5 before adding each fraction. 6/30 + 5/30 = 11/30. Subtract 3/9 from 7/9. 7/9 - 3/9 = 4/9

4. Algebra

20 (x) = 20x 4(x+3y) = 4x+12y

5. You can multiply large numbers without going through the long process of writing everything out. For example, if you had to multiply 52 times 14, try doing it in your head, beginning with mentally multiplying 52 times 10 in your head then mentally multiplying 52 times four then adding the two results in your head or on paper. Do: 52 x 14. Done? The answer is 728.

Hicks' Guide to Better Grades

The Everything Kids' Math Puzzles Book: Brain Teasers, Games, and Activities for Hours of Fun

100 Math Brain teasers (Grade 7, 8, 9, 10). Arithmetic, Algebra and Geometry Brain Teasers, Puzzles, Games and Problems with Solutions: Math olympiad contest problems for elementary and middle schools

Mahogany Laptop Cart

Multiply 8 by 4. Solve this equation by adding the number "8" to the original "8" three times. 8+8+8+8=32

2. Division

Divide 10 by 2. Reduce 10 as many times as you can above the division line then reduce 2 as many times as you can under the division line. You should come up with 5/1. 10 is divided by 2 five times.

3. Fractions

Add 1/5 and 1/6. Multiply the first fraction by 6 and the second fraction by 5 before adding each fraction. 6/30 + 5/30 = 11/30. Subtract 3/9 from 7/9. 7/9 - 3/9 = 4/9

4. Algebra

20 (x) = 20x 4(x+3y) = 4x+12y

5. You can multiply large numbers without going through the long process of writing everything out. For example, if you had to multiply 52 times 14, try doing it in your head, beginning with mentally multiplying 52 times 10 in your head then mentally multiplying 52 times four then adding the two results in your head or on paper. Do: 52 x 14. Done? The answer is 728.

**You're not**ready to leave, are you? This couldn't be possible because you haven't finished taking care of business. Quit wasting your time or letting your kids suffer from having poor grades. Solve this problem**now**by investing in my study guide located above or the one below plus the**following math****aids**that can boost your grades or those of your kids and enhance the overall student experience.Hicks' Guide to Better Grades

The Everything Kids' Math Puzzles Book: Brain Teasers, Games, and Activities for Hours of Fun

100 Math Brain teasers (Grade 7, 8, 9, 10). Arithmetic, Algebra and Geometry Brain Teasers, Puzzles, Games and Problems with Solutions: Math olympiad contest problems for elementary and middle schools

__Home Styles Bedford Student Desk with Hutch__Mahogany Laptop Cart

## No comments:

## Post a Comment